THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre 4th Fl
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Jeffrey Manning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manning (CPSO#: 59386 )
Business Address: 99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
4th Floor
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
(519) 756-6400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Paul Family Health Network
St. Joseph's Lifecare Centre 4th Fl
99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 756-6400
Fax: (519) 756-7343

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Jeffrey Manning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Manning (CPSO#: 59386 )
Business Address: 99 Wayne Gretzky Parkway
4th Floor
Brantford Ontario N3S 6T6
(519) 756-6400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN JEFFREY MANNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANNING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN JEFFREY MANNING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANNING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988