THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:51:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300 2
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 4
Fax: (905) 844-4906
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DAVID MCCONACHIE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McConachie (CPSO#: 59388 )
Business Address: 690 Dorval Dr
300-2
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
9058494567-4

Corporation Name: David McConachie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 300 2
690 Dorval Drive
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 849-4567
Extension: 4
Fax: (905) 844-4906
Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M0L8
Phone: 905 845 2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DAVID MCCONACHIE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McConachie (CPSO#: 59388 )
Business Address: 690 Dorval Dr
300-2
Oakville ON L6K 3W7
9058494567-4

Corporation Name: David McConachie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID REID MCCONACHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONACHIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID REID MCCONACHIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCCONACHIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988