THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 17:33:33 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4335
Fax: (519) 258-8718

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey J. Price Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Price (CPSO#: 59404 )
Business Address: Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 258-4335

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4335
Fax: (519) 258-8718

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey J. Price Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Price (CPSO#: 59404 )
Business Address: Suite 200
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
(519) 258-4335

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAMES PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAMES PRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PRICE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988