THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:02:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1355 Bank Street
Suite 502
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097
Address: 23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc BLVD
Orléans Ontario K1C6V8
Phone: 6137495421
Fax: 6138308211

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Dawdy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dawdy (CPSO#: 59417 )
Business Address: 502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584
Business Address: 23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc
Orléans Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 830-8211

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1355 Bank Street
Suite 502
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Fax: (613) 738-9097
Address: 23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc BLVD
Orléans Ontario K1C6V8
Phone: 6137495421
Fax: 6138308211

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Dawdy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dawdy (CPSO#: 59417 )
Business Address: 502 - 1355 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8K7
(613) 738-1584
Business Address: 23 - 5929 Jeanne D'Arc
Orléans Ontario K1C 6V8
(613) 830-8211

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ALDEN DAWDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWDY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN ALDEN DAWDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAWDY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988