THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:25:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 504
421 Bay Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 256-6012
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Aug 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy J. Best Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Best (CPSO#: 59419 )
Business Address: 504 - 421 Bay Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 1X3
(705) 256-6012

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 504
421 Bay Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 256-6012
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 30 Aug 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy J. Best Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Best (CPSO#: 59419 )
Business Address: 504 - 421 Bay Street
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6A 1X3
(705) 256-6012

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN BEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEST is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN BEST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BEST is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Sep 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 20 Sep 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1997

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Sep 1996

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1993

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 1991

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988