THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 07:08:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Radiology Consultants
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite LL01
L4M 0H9
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 722-8036
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 1G4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Gordon Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Paul (CPSO#: 59451 )
Business Address: Little Lake Health Centre
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite LL01
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 722-8036
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

Corporation Name: Dr. T. G. Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Dec 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Radiology Consultants
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite LL01
L4M 0H9
Barrie Ontario L4N 1L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 722-8036
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 1G4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site Penetanguishene
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
HOSPITAL: Collingwood General and Marine Hospital
LOCATION: Collingwood

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital Penetanguishene Site
LOCATION: Penetanguishene

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Gordon Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Paul (CPSO#: 59451 )
Business Address: Little Lake Health Centre
11 Lakeside Terrace
Suite LL01
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 722-8036
Business Address: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090

Corporation Name: Dr. T. G. Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Dec 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS GORDON PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THOMAS GORDON PAUL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAUL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988