THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:21:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Bristol Circle
Suite A101
Oakville Ontario L6H 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 569-3007
Fax: (905) 569-2054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Langlois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Langlois (CPSO#: 59453 )
Business Address: Suite 101
2401 Bristol Circle
Oakville Ontario L6H 5S9
(905) 569-3007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2401 Bristol Circle
Suite A101
Oakville Ontario L6H 5S9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 569-3007
Fax: (905) 569-2054

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 03 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Langlois Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Langlois (CPSO#: 59453 )
Business Address: Suite 101
2401 Bristol Circle
Oakville Ontario L6H 5S9
(905) 569-3007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN LANGLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLOIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILLIAM JOHN LANGLOIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANGLOIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988