THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:00:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph Medical Imaging
54 Cardigan St.
Guelph,ON
Guelph Ontario N1H 3Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-314-0778
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Guelph Medical Imaging
33 Farley Dr.
Guelph ON
Guelph Ontario N1L 0B7
Phone: 226-314-0778
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Whitby Medical X-ray and Ultrasound
402-220 Dundas St. W.
Whitby
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
Phone: 905-430-1781
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Kravis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kravis (CPSO#: 59456 )
Business Address: 54 Cardigan Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 3Z6
(226) 314-0778
Business Address: 2374 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1K 2P4
(416) 757-8497

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2007

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, LATVIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph Medical Imaging
54 Cardigan St.
Guelph,ON
Guelph Ontario N1H 3Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-314-0778
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Guelph Medical Imaging
33 Farley Dr.
Guelph ON
Guelph Ontario N1L 0B7
Phone: 226-314-0778
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Whitby Medical X-ray and Ultrasound
402-220 Dundas St. W.
Whitby
Whitby Ontario L1N 8M7
Phone: 905-430-1781
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marc Kravis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kravis (CPSO#: 59456 )
Business Address: 54 Cardigan Street
Guelph Ontario N1H 3Z6
(226) 314-0778
Business Address: 2374 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1K 2P4
(416) 757-8497

Corporation Name: Knapp Citren Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Oct 2007

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC JOHN MARGERIS KRAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAVIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARC JOHN MARGERIS KRAVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRAVIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988