THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:13:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
E W 1 - 435
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5328
Fax: (416) 603-3437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nizar Mahomed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mahomed (CPSO#: 59463 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
EW 1-435 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5328

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Toronto Western Hospital
Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
E W 1 - 435
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 603-5328
Fax: (416) 603-3437

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nizar Mahomed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Nov 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Mahomed (CPSO#: 59463 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
EW 1-435 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5328

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIZAR NOORALLAH MAHOMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHOMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIZAR NOORALLAH MAHOMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAHOMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988