THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:55:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Road
Unit 6
Scarborough ON M1H2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164317100
Fax: 4164317191
Address: 40 Blowers Cres.
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0N4
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: 9052311849
Address: 5460 Yonge Street
Suite 204
North York Ontario M2N 6K7
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323
Address: 6 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2N 6L1
Phone: 416 250 7171
Fax: 416 250 0323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Wan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wan (CPSO#: 59477 )
Business Address: Boniface Park Medical Centre
6 - 700 Markham Road
Richmond Hill Ontario M1H 2A7
(416) 431-7100
Business Address: Suite 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Boniface Park Medical Centre
700 Markham Road
Unit 6
Scarborough ON M1H2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164317100
Fax: 4164317191
Address: 40 Blowers Cres.
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0N4
Phone: 9052311829
Fax: 9052311849
Address: 5460 Yonge Street
Suite 204
North York Ontario M2N 6K7
Phone: (416) 250-7171
Fax: (416) 250-0323
Address: 6 Finch Ave W
North York ON M2N 6L1
Phone: 416 250 7171
Fax: 416 250 0323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Wan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Wan (CPSO#: 59477 )
Business Address: Boniface Park Medical Centre
6 - 700 Markham Road
Richmond Hill Ontario M1H 2A7
(416) 431-7100
Business Address: Suite 204
5460 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M2N 6K7
(416) 250-7171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER SHIU KEE WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER SHIU KEE WAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988