THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 06:18:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 133
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-8357
Fax: (519) 941-0027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey L. McKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKinnon (CPSO#: 59479 )
Business Address: 133 - 150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 940-0961

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 133
150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 941-8357
Fax: (519) 941-0027

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Headwaters Health Care Centre Orangeville
HOSPITAL: Headwaters Health Care Centre
LOCATION: Orangeville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey L. McKinnon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKinnon (CPSO#: 59479 )
Business Address: 133 - 150 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 940-0961

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY LUKE MCKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEFFREY LUKE MCKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988