THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:03:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-6966
Fax: (705) 725-7330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Ballagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ballagh (CPSO#: 59480 )
Business Address: 402 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 726-6966

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 402
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-6966
Fax: (705) 725-7330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 03 Sep 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Ballagh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ballagh (CPSO#: 59480 )
Business Address: 402 - 11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 726-6966

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT HAMILTON BALLAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLAGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT HAMILTON BALLAGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALLAGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988