THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:24:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eva Road
Toronto Ontario M9C
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-231-7968
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 102 d-2381 Bristol Circle
Insight Health Solutions Trillium Health Partners
suite 102 Door D
Oakville Ontario L6H 5S9
Phone: 905-813-4187
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jodi L. Grenier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grenier (CPSO#: 59494 ) Dr. D. Rosso (CPSO#: 62250 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Corporation Name: Dominic Rosso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grenier (CPSO#: 59494 ) Dr. D. Rosso (CPSO#: 62250 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100 Extn: 3497

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Eva Road
Toronto Ontario M9C
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-231-7968
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 102 d-2381 Bristol Circle
Insight Health Solutions Trillium Health Partners
suite 102 Door D
Oakville Ontario L6H 5S9
Phone: 905-813-4187
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jodi L. Grenier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grenier (CPSO#: 59494 ) Dr. D. Rosso (CPSO#: 62250 )
Business Address: Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100

Corporation Name: Dominic Rosso Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grenier (CPSO#: 59494 ) Dr. D. Rosso (CPSO#: 62250 )
Business Address: 100 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
(905) 848-7100 Extn: 3497

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODI LEIGH GRENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRENIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODI LEIGH GRENIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRENIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988