THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:29:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-348 Muskoka Rd 3 N
Huntsville ON P1H 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-789-2355
Fax: 705-789-1051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheena Branigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Branigan (CPSO#: 59505 )
Business Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1G 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: 104 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-2355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-348 Muskoka Rd 3 N
Huntsville ON P1H 1H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-789-2355
Fax: 705-789-1051

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheena Branigan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Branigan (CPSO#: 59505 )
Business Address: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1G 1H7
(705) 789-2311
Business Address: 104 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 789-2355

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEENA MARY BRANIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANIGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHEENA MARY BRANIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANIGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988