THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-464-4500
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2670 Lakeshore Rd
Brights Grove Ontario N0N 1C0
Phone: (519) 869-6900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1150 Pontiac Dr
Sarnia ON N7S 3A7
Phone: 519 339-8949
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Hislop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hislop (CPSO#: 59512 )
Business Address: 1150 Pontiac Dr
Sarnia ON N7S 3A7
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4500 Extn: 5214
Business Address: 2600 Lakeshore Road
Brights Grove Ontario N0N 1C0
(519) 869-6900

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-464-4500
Extension: 5214
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2670 Lakeshore Rd
Brights Grove Ontario N0N 1C0
Phone: (519) 869-6900
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1150 Pontiac Dr
Sarnia ON N7S 3A7
Phone: 519 339-8949
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 05 Dec 1994
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Hislop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Hislop (CPSO#: 59512 )
Business Address: 1150 Pontiac Dr
Sarnia ON N7S 3A7
Business Address: Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4500 Extn: 5214
Business Address: 2600 Lakeshore Road
Brights Grove Ontario N0N 1C0
(519) 869-6900

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN HISLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HISLOP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT IAN HISLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HISLOP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988