THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:05:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Dublin Street
Mount Forest Ontario N0G 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 323-0255
Fax: (519) 323-2113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Reaume Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reaume (CPSO#: 59518 )
Business Address: Clair Stewart Medical Clinic
525 Dublin Street
Mount Forest Ontario N0G 2L3
(519) 323-0255

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 525 Dublin Street
Mount Forest Ontario N0G 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 323-0255
Fax: (519) 323-2113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Reaume Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Reaume (CPSO#: 59518 )
Business Address: Clair Stewart Medical Clinic
525 Dublin Street
Mount Forest Ontario N0G 2L3
(519) 323-0255

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH REAUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REAUME is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN KENNETH REAUME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REAUME is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988