THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:56:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
The Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Bain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bain (CPSO#: 59520 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
The Respiratory Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-7777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Michael Garron Hospital
The Chest Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 469-7777
Fax: (416) 469-7717

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 22 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Bain Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bain (CPSO#: 59520 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
The Respiratory Centre
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-7777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JAMES BAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JAMES BAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988