THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-2888
Fax: (905) 853-6607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Remo Zadra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zadra (CPSO#: 59554 )
Business Address: Unit 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 853-2888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 853-2888
Fax: (905) 853-6607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Remo Zadra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Apr 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Zadra (CPSO#: 59554 )
Business Address: Unit 208
712 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 8C3
(905) 853-2888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REMO ZADRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZADRA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REMO ZADRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZADRA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988