THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 501
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-7427
Fax: (705) 725-7313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 15 Sep 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathryn R. Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilkins (CPSO#: 59564 )
Business Address: Suite 501
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 726-7427

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 501
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 726-7427
Fax: (705) 725-7313

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 15 Sep 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathryn R. Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilkins (CPSO#: 59564 )
Business Address: Suite 501
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie Ontario L4M 0H9
(705) 726-7427

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN RUTH WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KATHRYN RUTH WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988