THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:35:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University
Department of Pathology
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-2850
Fax: (613) 548-6076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Boag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boag (CPSO#: 59570 )
Business Address: Queen's University
Department of Pathology
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-2850

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen's University
Department of Pathology
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 533-2850
Fax: (613) 548-6076

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Boag Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boag (CPSO#: 59570 )
Business Address: Queen's University
Department of Pathology
Kingston Ontario K7L 3N6
(613) 533-2850

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HARVEY BOAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOAG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HARVEY BOAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOAG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988