THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:48:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-206106 Highway 26
Meaford ON N4L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-662-0222
Fax: 226-662-0060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hudson (CPSO#: 59576 )
Business Address: Don Bumbstead and Family Medical Centre
1 - 206106 Highway 26
Meaford Ontario N4L 1L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-206106 Highway 26
Meaford ON N4L 1L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-662-0222
Fax: 226-662-0060

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site Meaford
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Meaford Site
LOCATION: Meaford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Hudson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 May 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hudson (CPSO#: 59576 )
Business Address: Don Bumbstead and Family Medical Centre
1 - 206106 Highway 26
Meaford Ontario N4L 1L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN ELIZABETH HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN ELIZABETH HUDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 May 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988