THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Brock Street North
Whitby Ontario L1N 4H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-3378
Fax: (905) 668-3807

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Szendrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Szendrey (CPSO#: 59577 )
Business Address: 200 Brock Street North
Whitby Ontario L1N 4H5
(905) 668-3378

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Brock Street North
Whitby Ontario L1N 4H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 668-3378
Fax: (905) 668-3807

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Szendrey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Szendrey (CPSO#: 59577 )
Business Address: 200 Brock Street North
Whitby Ontario L1N 4H5
(905) 668-3378

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH SZENDREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENDREY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES JOSEPH SZENDREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZENDREY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1988