THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa General Hospital
Suite W1646
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8081
Fax: (613) 737-8531

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey F. Dervin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dervin (CPSO#: 59592 )
Business Address: General Campus
Room W1646
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8081

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa General Hospital
Suite W1646
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8081
Fax: (613) 737-8531

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 18 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geoffrey F. Dervin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Mar 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dervin (CPSO#: 59592 )
Business Address: General Campus
Room W1646
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8081

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY FRANCIS DERVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERVIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GEOFFREY FRANCIS DERVIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DERVIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988