THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 06:00:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 Gainsborough Rd
Thompson Medical Centre
London ON N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Fax: (519) 204-0729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet McKay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKay (CPSO#: 59604 )
Business Address: 856 Manchester Road
London Ontario N6H 5H3
519-641-9036

Corporation Name: Janet McKay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 990 Gainsborough Rd
Thompson Medical Centre
London ON N6H 5L4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 601-8621
Fax: (519) 204-0729

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 20 Sep 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet McKay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. McKay (CPSO#: 59604 )
Business Address: 856 Manchester Road
London Ontario N6H 5H3
519-641-9036

Corporation Name: Janet McKay Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Feb 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH MCKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988