THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:45:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202 - 4700 Jane St
Toronto Ontario M3N 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 661-0004
Fax: (416) 661-0810
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room K3W 40
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6736
Fax: 416-480-5766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark A. Greenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Greenberg (CPSO#: 59605 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6736
Business Address: 4700 Jane Street
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M3N 2L3
(416) 661-0004
Business Address: 2-140 Syndicate Avenue South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 1C6
(807) 625-5400
Business Address: 69 Court Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4T7
(807) 633-6666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202 - 4700 Jane St
Toronto Ontario M3N 2L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 661-0004
Fax: (416) 661-0810
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room K3W 40
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6736
Fax: 416-480-5766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark A. Greenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Greenberg (CPSO#: 59605 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6736
Business Address: 4700 Jane Street
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M3N 2L3
(416) 661-0004
Business Address: 2-140 Syndicate Avenue South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 1C6
(807) 625-5400
Business Address: 69 Court Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4T7
(807) 633-6666

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALAN GREENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK ALAN GREENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988