THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:40:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A112-325 Bamburgh Cir
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162910980
Fax: 4162979666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Florence S.L. Yip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Yip (CPSO#: 59610 )
Business Address: Unit 28
3833 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1V 5L6
(416) 291-0980
Business Address: 112-325 Bamburgh Cir
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
4162910980

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A112-325 Bamburgh Cir
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162910980
Fax: 4162979666

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Florence S.L. Yip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Yip (CPSO#: 59610 )
Business Address: Unit 28
3833 Midland Avenue
Scarborough Ontario M1V 5L6
(416) 291-0980
Business Address: 112-325 Bamburgh Cir
Scarborough ON M1W 3Y1
4162910980

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FLORENCE SUE-LUNE YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FLORENCE SUE-LUNE YIP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YIP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988