THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 11:30:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Scarlett Rd
Etobicoke ON M9A 4S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166044000
Fax: 4166042982

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vipul Bhupal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bhupal (CPSO#: 59626 )
Business Address: 320 Scarlett Road
Toronto Ontario M9A 4S4
4166044000
Business Address: 265 Scarlett Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 4L1
(416) 604-4000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 Scarlett Rd
Etobicoke ON M9A 4S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166044000
Fax: 4166042982

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vipul Bhupal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Bhupal (CPSO#: 59626 )
Business Address: 320 Scarlett Road
Toronto Ontario M9A 4S4
4166044000
Business Address: 265 Scarlett Road
Toronto Ontario M6N 4L1
(416) 604-4000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIPUL KUMAR BHUPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHUPAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VIPUL KUMAR BHUPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHUPAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Jun 2014
Summary of Decision:
On June 6, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Vipul Kumar Bhupal committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Bhupal admitted to the allegation.

The referral relates to a s.75 investigation regarding the appropriateness of Dr. Bhupal's referrals of patients for cardiac testing to a company that rented part of his office space from him.

With respect to Patient A, Dr. Bhupal ordered echocardiograms without appropriate indications, and failed to order a lipid profile to fully assess the patient's cardiovascular risk. Dr. Bhupal further failed to refer the patient to a cardiologist for a nuclear stress test following her echocardiograms and stress echocardiograms, and failed to maintain the standard of practice with respect to record keeping in that his chart lacked adequate means of tracking test results.

With respect to Patient B, Dr. Bhupal ordered multiple echocardiograms and stress echocardiograms without sufficient indication for this patient, even after a cardiologist indicated they were unnecessary. Patient B underwent twelve echocardiograms over a period of five years.

With respect to Patient C, Dr. Bhupal failed to order appropriate laboratory tests and ordered stress echocardiography without indication before conducting an appropriate history and physical exam for this patient who presented with palpitations.

With respect to Patient D, Dr. Bhupal ordered unnecessary repeat echocardiography for this patient, even after consultation with a cardiologist who indicated the following: the cardiologist would be doing repeat tests; he does not believe the pain to be cardiac; and his impression is that there is nothing serious going on. Further, Dr. Bhupal failed to maintain the standard of practice with regard to his record keeping in that his chart contains no details of physical findings or history pertaining to his ordering of echocardiography and stress echocardiography for this patient.

With respect to Patient E, Dr. Bhupal ordered stress echocardiography without appropriate indications in this patient with a two week history of dizziness with exertion, no chest pain or shortness of breath. There was no blood work, EKG or Holter, which should have been the first steps taken by Dr. Bhupal.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

Dr. Bhupal appear before the panel to be reprimanded;

the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bhupal's Certificate of Registration:

(i) Within 6 months of the date of this Order, Dr. Bhupal shall undergo a Comprehensive Practice Assessment by an assessor or assessors appointed by the College (the "Assessor(s)").

(ii) Dr. Bhupal shall abide by any and all recommendations of the Assessor(s),including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or education.

(iii)Dr. Bhupal shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated with his compliance with the terms of this Order.

Dr. Bhupal pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 6, 2014

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 06 Jun 2014
Summary of Decision:
On June 6, 2014, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Vipul Kumar Bhupal committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. Dr. Bhupal admitted to the allegation.

The referral relates to a s.75 investigation regarding the appropriateness of Dr. Bhupal's referrals of patients for cardiac testing to a company that rented part of his office space from him.

With respect to Patient A, Dr. Bhupal ordered echocardiograms without appropriate indications, and failed to order a lipid profile to fully assess the patient's cardiovascular risk. Dr. Bhupal further failed to refer the patient to a cardiologist for a nuclear stress test following her echocardiograms and stress echocardiograms, and failed to maintain the standard of practice with respect to record keeping in that his chart lacked adequate means of tracking test results.

With respect to Patient B, Dr. Bhupal ordered multiple echocardiograms and stress echocardiograms without sufficient indication for this patient, even after a cardiologist indicated they were unnecessary. Patient B underwent twelve echocardiograms over a period of five years.

With respect to Patient C, Dr. Bhupal failed to order appropriate laboratory tests and ordered stress echocardiography without indication before conducting an appropriate history and physical exam for this patient who presented with palpitations.

With respect to Patient D, Dr. Bhupal ordered unnecessary repeat echocardiography for this patient, even after consultation with a cardiologist who indicated the following: the cardiologist would be doing repeat tests; he does not believe the pain to be cardiac; and his impression is that there is nothing serious going on. Further, Dr. Bhupal failed to maintain the standard of practice with regard to his record keeping in that his chart contains no details of physical findings or history pertaining to his ordering of echocardiography and stress echocardiography for this patient.

With respect to Patient E, Dr. Bhupal ordered stress echocardiography without appropriate indications in this patient with a two week history of dizziness with exertion, no chest pain or shortness of breath. There was no blood work, EKG or Holter, which should have been the first steps taken by Dr. Bhupal.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

Dr. Bhupal appear before the panel to be reprimanded;

the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Bhupal's Certificate of Registration:

(i) Within 6 months of the date of this Order, Dr. Bhupal shall undergo a Comprehensive Practice Assessment by an assessor or assessors appointed by the College (the "Assessor(s)").

(ii) Dr. Bhupal shall abide by any and all recommendations of the Assessor(s),including with respect to any practice improvements and/or ongoing professional development and/or education.

(iii)Dr. Bhupal shall be solely responsible for all fees, costs and expenses associated with his compliance with the terms of this Order.

Dr. Bhupal pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 6, 2014

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 May 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988