THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:51:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 3639
Fax: (705) 495-7945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Cochrane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cochrane (CPSO#: 59630 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600 Extn: 3639

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Extension: 3639
Fax: (705) 495-7945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Cochrane Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Jun 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cochrane (CPSO#: 59630 )
Business Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 0A4
(705) 474-8600 Extn: 3639

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH COCHRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCHRANE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID KENNETH COCHRANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COCHRANE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988