THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Bradwick Dr
Unit 200
Concord ON L4K 5V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-812-8599
Fax: 647-777-6134

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Rittenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rittenberg (CPSO#: 59648 )
Business Address: 200-400 Bradwick Dr
Concord ON L4K 5V9
647-812-8599
Business Address: 17 - 531 Atkinson Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L4J 8L7
(905) 660-9760

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 400 Bradwick Dr
Unit 200
Concord ON L4K 5V9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-812-8599
Fax: 647-777-6134

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
HOSPITAL: Kirkland and District Hospital
LOCATION: Kirkland Lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Rittenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Rittenberg (CPSO#: 59648 )
Business Address: 200-400 Bradwick Dr
Concord ON L4K 5V9
647-812-8599
Business Address: 17 - 531 Atkinson Avenue
Thornhill Ontario L4J 8L7
(905) 660-9760

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN MARK RITTENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITTENBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN MARK RITTENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RITTENBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988