THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:40:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
7725 Birchmount Road
Markham Ontario L3R 9X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 475-9700
Fax: (905) 475-5913

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Alan Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shapero (CPSO#: 59652 )
Business Address: 5-7725 Birchmount Road
Markham Ontario L3R 9X3
(905) 475-9700

Corporation Name: Gary Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 5
7725 Birchmount Road
Markham Ontario L3R 9X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 475-9700
Fax: (905) 475-5913

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gary Alan Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shapero (CPSO#: 59652 )
Business Address: 5-7725 Birchmount Road
Markham Ontario L3R 9X3
(905) 475-9700

Corporation Name: Gary Shapero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Sep 2019

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY ALAN SHAPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPERO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY ALAN SHAPERO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPERO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988