THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:18:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital
Ophthalmology
M Wing, 1st floor
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 4762
Fax: 1 844 222 4523
Address: 10240 Kingsway NW
Edmonton AB T5H 3V9
Phone: 7807358784
Fax: 7807355242
Address: Department Of Ophthalmology
Hospital For Sick Childrren
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8606
Fax: (416) 813-8266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 24 Oct 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edsel Ing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ing (CPSO#: 59654 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital Eye Clinic
M Wing 1st floor
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-4762

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital
Ophthalmology
M Wing, 1st floor
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480 4762
Fax: 1 844 222 4523
Address: 10240 Kingsway NW
Edmonton AB T5H 3V9
Phone: 7807358784
Fax: 7807355242
Address: Department Of Ophthalmology
Hospital For Sick Childrren
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8606
Fax: (416) 813-8266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 24 Oct 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edsel Ing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ing (CPSO#: 59654 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Hospital Eye Clinic
M Wing 1st floor
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
416-480-4762

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDSEL BILL ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EDSEL BILL ING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988