THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 165 Dundas Street West
Suite 500
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 896-1244
Fax: (905) 896-1290
Address: Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Blvd
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Fax: (905) 816-9833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.W. Scheufler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Scheufler (CPSO#: 59659 )
Business Address: 500 - 165 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N6
(905) 896-1244

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 165 Dundas Street West
Suite 500
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 896-1244
Fax: (905) 896-1290
Address: Reproductive Care Centre
2180 Meadowvale Blvd
Mississauga Ontario L5N 5S3
Phone: (905) 816-9822
Fax: (905) 816-9833

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.W. Scheufler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Scheufler (CPSO#: 59659 )
Business Address: 500 - 165 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2N6
(905) 896-1244

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM SCHEUFLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEUFLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM SCHEUFLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHEUFLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988