THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:56:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4370
Extension: 5715
Fax: (519) 749-4378

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Knight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Knight (CPSO#: 59668 )
Business Address: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO BOX 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4370

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
P O Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4370
Extension: 5715
Fax: (519) 749-4378

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Oncology
Effective: 07 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Groves Memorial Community Hospital Fergus
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Groves Memorial Community Hospital
LOCATION: Fergus

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Louise Marshall Hospital North Wellington Health Care
LOCATION: Mount Forest

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Knight Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Knight (CPSO#: 59668 )
Business Address: Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO BOX 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4370

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY JOHN KNIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KNIGHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988