THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:53:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Adult And Pediatric Urology
Canada Place Building
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-0992
Fax: (705) 474-1148

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 11 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernard Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Goldfarb (CPSO#: 59681 )
Business Address: Canada Place Building
Adult and Pediatric Urology
Unit 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 7K8
(705) 474-0992

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Adult And Pediatric Urology
Canada Place Building
Suite 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 7K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-0992
Fax: (705) 474-1148

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 11 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: Temiskaming Hospital
LOCATION: New Liskeard

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bernard Goldfarb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Goldfarb (CPSO#: 59681 )
Business Address: Canada Place Building
Adult and Pediatric Urology
Unit 206
107 Shirreff Avenue
North Bay Ontario P1B 7K8
(705) 474-0992

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERNARD GOLDFARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDFARB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988