THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:06:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1466 Bathurst St.
Suite 205
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: (416) 483-8182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Sakuls Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sakuls (CPSO#: 59688 )
Business Address: Suite 205
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
(416) 483-8111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1466 Bathurst St.
Suite 205
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 483-8111
Fax: (416) 483-8182

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Sakuls Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sakuls (CPSO#: 59688 )
Business Address: Suite 205
1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5R 3S3
(416) 483-8111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER SAKULS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKULS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER SAKULS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAKULS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988