THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 02:27:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 8
389 Main Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 476-8323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BLANCHARD AND NANCEKIEVILL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nancekievill (CPSO#: 59700 ) Dr. S. Blanchard (CPSO#: 57130 )
Business Address: 8-389 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613-476-8323

Corporation Name: Blanchard and Nancekievill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 8
389 Main Street
Picton Ontario K0K 2T0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 476-8323
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site
LOCATION: Picton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BLANCHARD AND NANCEKIEVILL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nancekievill (CPSO#: 59700 ) Dr. S. Blanchard (CPSO#: 57130 )
Business Address: 8-389 Picton Main St
Picton ON K0K 2T0
613-476-8323

Corporation Name: Blanchard and Nancekievill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE NANCEKIEVILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANCEKIEVILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE NANCEKIEVILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANCEKIEVILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988