THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:47:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital, LHSC
Gastroenterology/Medicine
E6-321
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196676582
Extension: 2
Fax: 5196676820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Gregor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gregor (CPSO#: 59702 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
Suite E6-103
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6582

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 800 Commissioners Road East
Victoria Hospital, LHSC
Gastroenterology/Medicine
E6-321
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196676582
Extension: 2
Fax: 5196676820

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 15 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Gregor Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gregor (CPSO#: 59702 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
Suite E6-103
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 667-6582

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES CHRISTOPHER GREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES CHRISTOPHER GREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988