THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:29:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Homewood Ave
Wellesley St. Jamestown Health Centre
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shepherd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shepherd (CPSO#: 59712 )
Business Address: St. Michaels Health Centre
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K2
(416) 867-3725
Business Address: 101-95 Homewood Ave
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 95 Homewood Ave
Wellesley St. Jamestown Health Centre
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shepherd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shepherd (CPSO#: 59712 )
Business Address: St. Michaels Health Centre
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1K2
(416) 867-3725
Business Address: 101-95 Homewood Ave
Toronto ON M4Y 2K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY SHEPHERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPHERD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUSAN MARY SHEPHERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEPHERD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988