THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:36:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 462-0393
Fax: (416) 462-3612
Address: TLC Laser Eye Centre
Suite 212
2345 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E5
Phone: (416) 733-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nick Nianiaris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nianiaris (CPSO#: 59720 )
Business Address: Suite 202
245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 462-0393
Business Address: TLC Laser Eye Centers (Toronto)
Suite 212
2345 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E5
(416) 733-2020
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 462-0393
Fax: (416) 462-3612
Address: TLC Laser Eye Centre
Suite 212
2345 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E5
Phone: (416) 733-2020
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nick Nianiaris Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nianiaris (CPSO#: 59720 )
Business Address: Suite 202
245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 1N2
(416) 462-0393
Business Address: TLC Laser Eye Centers (Toronto)
Suite 212
2345 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4P 2E5
(416) 733-2020
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6580

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS NIANIARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIANIARIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS NIANIARIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIANIARIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988