THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:04:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: River Medical Centre
677 Dundas St east
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 362-8777
Fax: (416) 362-7879
Address: Corktown Medical Centre
1-589 KingSt East
Toronto Ontario M5A 1M6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brendan Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Malcolm (CPSO#: 59722 )
Business Address: Front Frederick Health
14th Floor
365 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 3L4
(416) 362-8777
Business Address: 677 Dundas St E
Toronto ON M5A 0R5
416-362-8777

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: River Medical Centre
677 Dundas St east
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M5A 2C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 362-8777
Fax: (416) 362-7879
Address: Corktown Medical Centre
1-589 KingSt East
Toronto Ontario M5A 1M6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brendan Malcolm Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Malcolm (CPSO#: 59722 )
Business Address: Front Frederick Health
14th Floor
365 Bloor Street East
Toronto Ontario M4W 3L4
(416) 362-8777
Business Address: 677 Dundas St E
Toronto ON M5A 0R5
416-362-8777

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDAN PATRICK MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRENDAN PATRICK MALCOLM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALCOLM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988