THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:04:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18-3545 Odyssey Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056079848
Fax: 9056079849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 28 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navin Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Anand (CPSO#: 59732 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 18-3545 Odyssey Dr
Mississauga ON L5M 2S4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056079848
Fax: 9056079849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 28 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1992
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1992
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Navin Anand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Anand (CPSO#: 59732 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVIN ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NAVIN ANAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988