THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3497 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7N 2R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 681-3315
Fax: (905) 681-6207

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 10 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel McGillivray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McGillivray (CPSO#: 59741 )
Business Address: 3497 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7N 2R4
(905) 681-6809

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3497 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7N 2R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 681-3315
Fax: (905) 681-6207

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 10 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 10 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel McGillivray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. McGillivray (CPSO#: 59741 )
Business Address: 3497 Fairview Street
Burlington Ontario L7N 2R4
(905) 681-6809

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL LACHLAN MCGILLIVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGILLIVRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL LACHLAN MCGILLIVRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCGILLIVRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988