THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:31:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: Lajoie, Ginette (Used Until: 11 Nov 2013)
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1988
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: EORLA
General Campus, The Ottawa Hospital
CCW - 4th floor - Room W4233
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 79230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Starkell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Starkell (CPSO#: 59747 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
3rd Floor South
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-8899 Extn: 79230

General Information

Former Name: Lajoie, Ginette (Used Until: 11 Nov 2013)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: EORLA
General Campus, The Ottawa Hospital
CCW - 4th floor - Room W4233
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-737-8899
Extension: 79230
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Starkell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Starkell (CPSO#: 59747 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
3rd Floor South
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
613-737-8899 Extn: 79230

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GINETTE STARKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STARKELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GINETTE STARKELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STARKELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988