THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:49:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 330
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-7386
Fax: (416) 497-4793
Address: Baycrest Health Sciences
Suite 1R37A
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 2682
Fax: (416) 785-2863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidney Feldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Feldman (CPSO#: 59756 ) Dr. K. Weyman (CPSO#: 60967 )
Business Address: 4164947386
Business Address: 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
4164947386

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidney Feldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Sep 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Suite 330
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 494-7386
Fax: (416) 497-4793
Address: Baycrest Health Sciences
Suite 1R37A
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Extension: 2682
Fax: (416) 785-2863

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Baycrest Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidney Feldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Feldman (CPSO#: 59756 ) Dr. K. Weyman (CPSO#: 60967 )
Business Address: 4164947386
Business Address: 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
4164947386

Corporation Name: Dr. Sidney Feldman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 21 Sep 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDNEY IRA DAVID FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIDNEY IRA DAVID FELDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FELDMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988