THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:32:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GREEK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 31 Aug 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dimitri J. Anastakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Anastakis (CPSO#: 59770 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
2nd Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5790
Business Address: 71 Sibley Ave
Omemee ON K0L 2W0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GREEK
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 31 Aug 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dimitri J. Anastakis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Anastakis (CPSO#: 59770 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
2nd Floor, East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5790
Business Address: 71 Sibley Ave
Omemee ON K0L 2W0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS JOHN ANASTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANASTAKIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS JOHN ANASTAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANASTAKIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988