THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:59:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 5P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807.624.3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Haggarty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Haggarty (CPSO#: 59777 )
Business Address: 710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 5P7
(807) 624-3400 Extn: 3457

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 5P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807.624.3400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1997
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1997
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Lakehead Psychiatric Hospital
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Haggarty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Haggarty (CPSO#: 59777 )
Business Address: 710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 5P7
(807) 624-3400 Extn: 3457

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL HAGGARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGGARTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN MICHAEL HAGGARTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAGGARTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988