THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:21:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 201a - 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Medicine - Division of Hematology
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 79520
Fax: (613) 737-8861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 19 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Imrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Imrie (CPSO#: 59793 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room-T2036
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4592
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Blood Disease Centre
Box 201a
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
4165602291

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Box 201a - 501 Smyth Rd
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Medicine - Division of Hematology
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 79520
Fax: (613) 737-8861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 19 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Imrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Imrie (CPSO#: 59793 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room-T2036
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4592
Business Address: 501 Smyth Rd
Ottawa Blood Disease Centre
Box 201a
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
4165602291

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT IMRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN ROBERT IMRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IMRIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988