THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:19:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. David Singleton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singleton (CPSO#: 59797 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 1993
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Shore Health Network Blind River
HOSPITAL: North Shore Health Network
LOCATION: Blind River

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. David Singleton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singleton (CPSO#: 59797 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID SINGLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLETON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID SINGLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLETON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988