THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:25:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217-2375 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1S 3L6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 291-9552
Fax: (416) 291-7139

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raphael Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kwok (CPSO#: 59814 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217-2375 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1S 3L6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 291-9552
Fax: (416) 291-7139

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raphael Kwok Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Feb 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kwok (CPSO#: 59814 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAPHAEL MAN BUN KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAPHAEL MAN BUN KWOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KWOK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, University of Hong Kong, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1988