THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:27:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Unit D
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137223987
Fax: 613-722-0902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Randall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Randall (CPSO#: 59820 )
Business Address: 770 Broadview Avenue
Suite 106
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
(613) 722-3987
Business Address: 1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Unit D
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V7
613-722-3987

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Unit D
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137223987
Fax: 613-722-0902

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 24 Jun 1998
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 1998
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Kemptville District Hospital
LOCATION: Kemptville

HOSPITAL: Queensway Carleton Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Randall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Randall (CPSO#: 59820 )
Business Address: 770 Broadview Avenue
Suite 106
Ottawa Ontario K2A 3Z3
(613) 722-3987
Business Address: 1371 Woodroffe Avenue
Unit D
Ottawa Ontario K2G 1V7
613-722-3987

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK RANDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES PATRICK RANDALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RANDALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1998
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 04 Nov 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 1994

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1988